This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 12/29/2019 at 22:55:18 (UTC).

MED-ADVANCED, CORP. VS WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/14/2019 MED-ADVANCED, CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MED-ADVANCED, CORP.

Defendant

WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

Felipe, Rodolfo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yulexy Solis Garcia

Defendant Attorney

Daniel E Faltas, Esq

 

Court Documents

Notice:

12/26/2019 - Notice:

Privilege Log

08/15/2019 - Privilege Log

Response to Request for Admissions

08/15/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

08/15/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Voluntary Dismissal

06/19/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Answer and Affirmative Defense

06/18/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Memorandum of Disposition

04/01/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/28/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

03/28/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

02/25/2019 - Demand for Jury Trial

Pre Trial Summons

02/01/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Request for Production

01/14/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

01/14/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

01/14/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

01/14/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Statement of Claim

01/14/2019 - Statement of Claim

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31495:2206; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3270024AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/01/2019 REGISTER#:327CASHIER:DAVERNF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3540114AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:YULEXY SOLIS GARCIA ANDREU, PALMA, LAVIN & SOLIS PLLC 815 NW 57 AVENUE MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.