Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/11/2021 at 02:46:09 (UTC).

MEB LOAN TRUST IV US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT VS GISELA GONZALEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 MEB LOAN TRUST IV US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GISELA GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Meb Loan Trust Iv Us Bank National Association Not

Defendants

Gonzalez, Gisela

Tidewater Finance Co Ta Tidewater Credit Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Collins, Sara Beth

 

Court Documents

Order of Default

06/10/2021 - Order of Default

Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

06/02/2021 - Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties

Motion for Summary Judgment

06/02/2021 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Default

06/02/2021 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

05/05/2021 - Service Returned

Service Return for Unknown Party

05/05/2021 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

05/05/2021 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

05/05/2021 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

05/05/2021 - Service Returned

Lis Pendens

04/08/2021 - Lis Pendens

Email Notice:

04/07/2021 - Email Notice:

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

04/07/2021 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Notice:

04/07/2021 - Notice:

Complaint

04/07/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/07/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Lis Pendens

04/08/2021 - Lis Pendens

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Tidewater Finance Co Ta Tidewater Credit Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 SERVED 05/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GISELA GONZALEZ, NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2, NOT SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gonzalez Gisela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2090032AMT PAID:$50.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE5$10.00$50.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$40.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/27/2021 REGISTER#:209CASHIER:TCOBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gonzalez Gisela; Tidewater Finance Co Ta Tidewater Credit Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2790050AMT PAID:$406.00 NAME:COLLINS, SARA BETH MCCALLA RAYMER PIERCE, LLC 225 E ROBINSON ST SUITE ORLANDO FL 32801-4326 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$406.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/09/2021 REGISTER#:279CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32449:4566; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MRSERVICE@MCCALLA.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meb Loan Trust Iii Us Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases where TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY T/A TIDEWATER CREDIT SERVICES AND TIDEWATER MOTOR CREDIT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARA B COLLINS, ESQ