Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/16/2021 at 13:30:10 (UTC).

MCBP ORTHOPEDICS & NEUROSURGERY, PLLC VS MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 MCBP ORTHOPEDICS NEUROSURGERY, PLLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCBP ORTHOPEDICS & NEUROSURGERY, PLLC

Assignor

Pena-Gutierrez, Janneth

Defendant

MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

 

Court Documents

Notice:

04/12/2021 - Notice:

Pre Trial Summons

03/12/2021 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

02/05/2021 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/05/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: Miami Beach Courtroom 2-1 1130 Washington Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PRE-TRIAL DATE FROM MAY 18, 2021 TO MAY 25, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2370007AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/12/2021 REGISTER#:237CASHIER:DPRATT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2590035AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:GREGORY E GUDIN LANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2C SUNRISE FL 33323 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/06/2021 REGISTER#:259CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MCBP ORTHOPEDICS & NEUROSURGERY, PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.