Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/04/2021 at 10:09:34 (UTC).

MCBP ORTHOPEDICS & NEUROSURGERY, PLLC VS MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 MCBP ORTHOPEDICS NEUROSURGERY, PLLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Coral Gables District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCBP ORTHOPEDICS & NEUROSURGERY, PLLC

Assignor

GUY JOHNSON

Defendant

MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mitzi Espino

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Process

01/21/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

Pre Trial Summons

12/31/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

11/03/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/03/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: Coral Gables Courtroom 01-3 3100 Ponce de Leon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2300005AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/31/2020 REGISTER#:230CASHIER:ROJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2540074AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:MITZI ESPINO 1250 E HALLANDALE BEACH BLVD STE 703 HALLANDALE BEACH FL 33009-4641 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERASTAR INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MCBP ORTHOPEDICS & NEUROSURGERY, PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitzi Espino