This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/11/2021 at 19:19:39 (UTC).

MAZAL INVESTMENTS 31 (LLC) VS MARIE MARTIN

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 MAZAL INVESTMENTS 31 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARIE MARTIN. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mazal Investments 31 (LLC)

Not Classified By Court and Defendant

Martin, Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan R Mccain

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/07/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

10/07/2021 - Complaint

Answer

10/19/2021 - Answer

Affidavit of Tenant - Center for Disease Control (CDC)

10/19/2021 - Affidavit of Tenant - Center for Disease Control (CDC)

Service Returned

10/21/2021 - Service Returned

Motion to Strike

10/25/2021 - Motion to Strike

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Martin Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Tenant - Center for Disease Control (CDC); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Martin Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2090004AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/14/2021REGISTER#:209CASHIER:ELIZABE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Martin Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000172AMT PAID:$185.00NAME:RYAN R MCCAINBARFIELD. MCCAIN , P.A. 4241 NORTHLAKE BLVD, STE BPALM BEACH GARDENS FL 33410COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185.00RECEIPT DATE:10/08/2021REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mazal Investments 31 (LLC) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN MCCAIN