This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/11/2021 at 19:09:30 (UTC).

MAZAL INVESTMENTS 21 (LLC) VS EMMANUEL AGENORD ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 MAZAL INVESTMENTS 21 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EMMANUEL AGENORD. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mazal Investments 21 (LLC)

Not Classified By Court and Defendants

Agenord, Emmanuel

Auguste, Frantzcia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan R Mccain

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Agenord Emmanuel; Auguste Frantzcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF OWNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Auguste Frantzcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Agenord Emmanuel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2090015AMT PAID:$20.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE2$10.00$20.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:10/14/2021REGISTER#:209CASHIER:ELIZABE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Auguste Frantzcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Agenord Emmanuel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3000167AMT PAID:$185.00NAME:RYAN R MCCAINBARFIELD. MCCAIN , P.A. 4241 NORTHLAKE BLVD, STE BPALM BEACH GARDENS FL 33410COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185.00RECEIPT DATE:10/08/2021REGISTER#:300CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN MCCAIN