This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/28/2021 at 00:13:31 (UTC).

MAUREEN MCCARTHY VS CITY OF MIAMI

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 MAUREEN MCCARTHY filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against CITY OF MIAMI. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

McCarthy, Maureen

Defendant

City of Miami

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Dooley, Rachel S.G.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/09/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

09/09/2020 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/16/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/17/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Motion for Extension of Time

10/19/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion to Dismiss

10/27/2020 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Hearing-

11/12/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Amended Notice of Hearing

11/12/2020 - Amended Notice of Hearing

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

12/02/2020 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Notice of Hearing-

12/22/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

12/23/2020 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Notice of Hearing-

01/15/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

02/08/2021 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Voluntary Dismissal

05/21/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

05/21/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32525:30; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH PREJUDICE Parties: City of Miami

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON 02/10/2021 AT 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 01/12/2021 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: 12/10/2020 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 12/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: City of Miami

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Dooley Rachel S.G.; City of Miami

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670060AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:09/18/2020REGISTER#:267CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: City of Miami

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2700039AMT PAID:$401.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:09/11/2020REGISTER#:270CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dooley, Rachel S.G.