This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 01/01/2023 at 21:04:57 (UTC).

MARY E VIMONT (PR) VS SEAN HERSCHMAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 MARY E VIMONT PR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SEAN HERSCHMAN. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VIMONT (PR), MARY E

MALEC (ESTATE OF) (DECEASED), MATTHEW

Defendants

Herschman, Sean

Herschman, Paula s S

Herschman, Matthew

 

Court Documents

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

12/27/2022 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Unavailability/absence

12/20/2022 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Order Extending Time for

12/14/2022 - Order Extending Time for

Notice of Interrogatory

12/12/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Service Returned

12/08/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

12/08/2022 - Service Returned

Request for Production

12/07/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

12/07/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

12/07/2022 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/22/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Taking Deposition

09/21/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

09/21/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

09/21/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice:

09/21/2022 - Notice:

Request for Production

09/21/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

09/21/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

09/21/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/21/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH IS GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Herschman Paula s S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Herschman Sean

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO OPPOSING PARTY AS TO SERVICE OF PLEADINGS VIA EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less