This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/05/2020 at 22:05:48 (UTC).

MARTINEZ, JANIS VS MEZA MENDOZA, CARLOS

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 MARTINEZ, JANIS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MEZA MENDOZA, CARLOS. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Martinez, Janis

Respondent

Meza Mendoza, Carlos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Corey, Joseph M., Jr

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

01/09/2020 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 10:00AM; Hearing Location: CHC Courtroom 20-C 175 N.W. 1st Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31774:4138; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 01-09-201030AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: CARLOS MEZA MONEDOZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Meza Mendoza Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3580032AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:COREY, JOSEPH M., JR. 900 W 49 ST STE 204 HIALEAH FL 33012-3443 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3339-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) ESummons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing and Serving Administrative Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Social Security Number; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Info Within Court Filing Accepted; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.