This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/11/2020 at 03:34:08 (UTC).

MARTHA MUNOZ (MANAGER) VS MARY E BEASLEY

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 MARTHA MUNOZ MANAGER filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MARY E BEASLEY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Munoz (Manager), Martha

Defendant

Beasley, Mary E

Not Classified By Court

Eviction Property Address

 

Court Documents

Order:

03/11/2020 - Order:

Default

03/02/2020 - Default

Affidavit of:

02/28/2020 - Affidavit of:

Service Returned

02/25/2020 - Service Returned

Complaint

02/14/2020 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: PACKAGE RETURNED W/CK #1105 SEE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DENYING PLNTFF'S MTN FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; THE MGR CANNOT FILE AN EVICTION IN HER NAME IT CAN ONLY BE DONE IN THE NAME OF THE OWNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Beasley Mary E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: COSTS, NON-PAYMENT AND NON-MILITARY; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Beasley Mary E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2840086AMT PAID:$195.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:TENDER AMT:$585.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/14/202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Beasley Mary E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Munoz (Manager) Martha; Beasley Mary E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.