This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/15/2020 at 02:45:55 (UTC).

MARTHA MUNOZ (MANAGER) VS. ABIGAIL MOORE

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 MARTHA MUNOZ MANAGER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ABIGAIL MOORE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Munoz (Manager), Martha

Defendant

Moore, Abigail

Not Classified By Court

Eviction Property Address

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Issued

03/09/2020 - Writ of Possession Issued

Final Judgment by Judge

03/04/2020 - Final Judgment by Judge

Final Judgment by Judge

03/04/2020 - Final Judgment by Judge

Default

03/02/2020 - Default

Affidavit of:

02/28/2020 - Affidavit of:

Service Returned

02/25/2020 - Service Returned

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/14/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

02/14/2020 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO SHERIFF WITH CHECK # 1104$115.00 Parties: Moore Abigail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31844:307; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Moore Abigail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Moore Abigail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: COSTS, NON-PAYMENT AND NON-MILITARY; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Moore Abigail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2840088AMT PAID:$195.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:TENDER AMT:$585.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/14/202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Moore Abigail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Munoz (Manager) Martha; Moore Abigail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.