This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/08/2021 at 03:15:46 (UTC).

MARTHA FERNANDEZ ET AL VS AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 MARTHA FERNANDEZ filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FERNANDEZ, MARTHA

FERNANDEZ, JUAN

Defendant

AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lopez, Anthony M

Santiago, Maximo A.

Defendant Attorney

Bustamante, Tiffany A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Production

10/29/2021 - Notice of Production

Notice of Filing:

10/22/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

10/22/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Motion:

10/19/2021 - Motion:

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

10/15/2021 - Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

10/15/2021 - Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

Motion for Relief from Judgment

09/13/2021 - Motion for Relief from Judgment

Notice of Filing:

09/10/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

09/10/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

09/10/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Order Extending Time for

08/31/2021 - Order Extending Time for

Stipulation

08/31/2021 - Stipulation

Notice of Unavailability/absence

08/03/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Order on Motion to Compel

07/27/2021 - Order on Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

07/26/2021 - Motion to Compel

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

07/22/2021 - Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

Subpoena

07/22/2021 - Subpoena

Notice:

07/22/2021 - Notice:

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S FILING VERIFICATION PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Relief from Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RESPONSES TO DEF'S. FIRST REQUEST OF INTERROGATORIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANYOF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2640132AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:LOPEZ, ANTHONY M 2601 SOUTH BAYSHORE DRIVE 18TH FLOOR COCONUT GROVE FL 33133-5412 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/29/2021 REGISTER#:264CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2610108AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:LOPEZ, ANTHONY M 2601 SOUTH BAYSHORE DRIVE 18TH FLOOR COCONUT GROVE FL 33133-5412 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/27/2021 REGISTER#:261CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto Club Insurance Company of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bustamante, Tiffany A