This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/01/2022 at 04:36:07 (UTC).

MARSDREAMLAND, LP VS CHARLES MCGRIFF ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 MARSDREAMLAND, LP filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against CHARLES MCGRIFF. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARSDREAMLAND, LP

Defendants

MCGRIFF, CHARLES

MILLER , LEO

MILLER, LEO J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Niles B Whitten

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/02/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

09/02/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/09/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/09/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/14/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/14/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040301AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:NILES B WHITTEN9200 NW 39TH AVENUE SUITE 130-3007GAINESVILLE FL 32614-0542COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:09/15/2022REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: MCGRIFF CHARLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: MILLERLEO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120056AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:NILES B WHITTEN9200 NW 39TH AVENUE SUITE 130-3007GAINESVILLE FL 32614-0542COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:09/10/2022REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less