This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/21/2022 at 02:01:03 (UTC).

MARINA COVE AT HARBOR VILLAGE CONDO. ASSOC. INC. VS CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON (170066) ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 MARINA COVE AT HARBOR VILLAGE CONDO ASSOC INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON 170066. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARINA COVE AT HARBOR VILLAGE CONDO. ASSOC. INC.

Defendants

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON (170066)

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON (170115)

HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE

GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA

INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF HANNOVER SE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin P Cernitz

 

Court Documents

Complaint

07/19/2022 - Complaint

Email Notice:

07/19/2022 - Email Notice:

Notice of Taking Deposition

07/19/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

07/19/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

07/19/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

07/19/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Interrogatory

07/19/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

07/19/2022 - Request for Production

Request for Production

07/19/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Appearance

08/17/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

08/17/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/26/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/26/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/26/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/26/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/20/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/20/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/20/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 21. Parties: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON (170115)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 20. Parties: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON (170066)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 19. Parties: HDI GLOBAL SPECIALTY SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 18. Parties: GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARINA COVE AT HARBOR VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF HANNOVER SE is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL SECURITY AND INDEMNITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cernitz, Justin P