This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/28/2023 at 08:47:24 (UTC).

MARILYN MILIAN VS AIRBNB, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 MARILYN MILIAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AIRBNB, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Milian, Marilyn

Defendant

AIRBNB, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schlesinger, John Charles

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/10/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/10/2023 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

01/17/2023 - Pre Trial Summons

Motion for Default

02/07/2023 - Motion for Default

Notice of Default Not Entered

02/09/2023 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Service Returned

02/15/2023 - Service Returned

Notice of Appearance

02/16/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Email Notice:

02/16/2023 - Email Notice:

Mediators Report

02/16/2023 - Mediators Report

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/22/2023 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

02/27/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:00AM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Mediators Report; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: 1. PRIMARY: KHURRUM@WVGLEGAL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AIRBNB INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2980004AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/17/2023REGISTER#:298CASHIER:TCOBB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: AIRBNB INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100318AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:MILIAN, MARILYN300 STILLWATER AVESTAMFORD CT 06902-3650COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:01/11/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less