This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/19/2023 at 15:39:12 (UTC).

MARILUZ MELENDEZ VS PEDRO GARCIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/12/2022 MARILUZ MELENDEZ filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against PEDRO GARCIA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melendez, Mariluz

Defendants

Garcia, Pedro

Cam, Peter

Zingale, Jim

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Johnson, Sherri Lynn

Defendant Attorney

Cruz, Ileana

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/12/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

12/12/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/17/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/17/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/17/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/22/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/22/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/22/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

04/12/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

04/12/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

04/17/2023 - Service Returned

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/17/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice of Appearance

04/18/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

05/02/2023 - Notice of Appearance

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cruz Ileana; Garcia Pedro; Cam Peter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Cam Peter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Zingale Jim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Garcia Pedro

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170031AMT PAID:$30.00NAME:JOHNSON, SHERRI LYNNPO BOX 20998SARASOTA FL 34276-3998COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:03/22/2023REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080120AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JOHNSON, SHERRI LYNNPO BOX 20998SARASOTA FL 34276-3998COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:12/14/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less