This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/04/2021 at 09:46:11 (UTC).

MARIA SCOTT VS MARIA GONZALEZ TORRES

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 MARIA SCOTT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIA GONZALEZ TORRES. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott, Maria

Defendant

Gonzalez Torres, Maria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry G Roderman

Defendant Attorney

Bejamin L Bedard

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/14/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

09/14/2021 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/15/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/16/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

10/12/2021 - Service Returned

Notice of Appearance

10/18/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Unavailability/absence

10/18/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Email Notice:

10/18/2021 - Email Notice:

Service Returned

10/18/2021 - Service Returned

Answer and Affirmative Defense

10/27/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Interrogatory

10/27/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

10/27/2021 - Request for Production

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gonzalez Torres Maria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gonzalez Torres Maria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVICE_BLB@RRBPA.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Bejamin L Bedard; Gonzalez Torres Maria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gonzalez Torres Maria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020137AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:BARRY G RODERMAN TRIAL LAWYERS BUILDING 633 SOUTHEAST 3RD AVENUE, S FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/17/2021 REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Gonzalez Torres Maria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2950137AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:BARRY G RODERMAN TRIAL LAWYERS BUILDING 633 SOUTHEAST 3RD AVENUE, S FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/16/2021 REGISTER#:295CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEDARD, BENJAMIN LAWRENCE