This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/20/2022 at 03:19:45 (UTC).

MARIA GRAY ET AL VS THALYS OLIVEIRA ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 MARIA GRAY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THALYS OLIVEIRA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gray, Maria

Gray, Daniel

Gray, Sasha

GRAY (ESTATE OF) (DECEASED), ARYA

Defendants

Oliveira, Thalys

Martins, Tatiana

Pedraza, Johan

Oliveira Gomes, Francisco

Moreno, Edgar, Jr

Moreno, Edgar Jose

Moreno Roa, Yadira

Ayres Netto, Carlos Eduardo

Faillace, Henriete Denise

Dome Condominium Association, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Corcilli, Mariano Ariel

 

Court Documents

Notice:

09/16/2022 - Notice:

Response to Request for Admissions

09/16/2022 - Response to Request for Admissions

Motion to Strike

09/13/2022 - Motion to Strike

Order Extending Time for

09/12/2022 - Order Extending Time for

Notice of Unavailability/absence

09/08/2022 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Motion for Extension of Time

09/08/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

09/06/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

09/06/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

09/02/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/25/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/25/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/25/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/25/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/25/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/25/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/25/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

05/11/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/11/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SERVING RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT IS GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090168AMT PAID:$413.50NAME:CORCILLI, MARIANO ARIELTHE CORCILLI LAW FIRM 1666 KENNEDY CAUSEWAY, SUITEMIAMI FL 33141COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$12.50$12.50TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$413.50RECEIPT DATE:05/12/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dome Condominium Association Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Corcilli, Mariano Ariel