This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/26/2022 at 03:50:14 (UTC).

MARIA CASTELLANOS VS DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 MARIA CASTELLANOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Castellanos, Maria

Defendant

Dollar Tree Stores, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dandashly, Mustafa H.

Defendant Attorney

Cosio, Eduardo

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/10/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/10/2022 - Complaint

Notice of Interrogatory

01/10/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/10/2022 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/14/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/19/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

01/26/2022 - Service Returned

Answer and Affirmative Defense

02/14/2022 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Taking Deposition

02/14/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Request for Production

02/14/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

02/14/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Unavailability/absence

02/16/2022 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Motion:

02/16/2022 - Motion:

Motion for Extension of Time

03/10/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

03/22/2022 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

03/22/2022 - Response to Request for Production

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO BE NOTIFIED OF SURGERIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cosio Eduardo; Dollar Tree Stores Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010008AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:DANDASHLY, MUSTAFA H.GOLDBERG & ROSEN, P.A. 1111 BRICKELL AVENUE SUITEMIAMI FL 33131COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/20/2022REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Dollar Tree Stores Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2950194AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:DANDASHLY, MUSTAFA H.GOLDBERG & ROSEN, P.A. 1111 BRICKELL AVENUE SUITEMIAMI FL 33131COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:01/11/2022REGISTER#:295CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cosio, Eduardo