This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/11/2021 at 04:27:54 (UTC).

MARI RIBEIRO (PR) ET AL VS U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 MARI RIBEIRO PR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against U S SECURITY ASSOCIATES, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ribeiro (PR), Mari

ESTATE OF SERGIO GUADRON (THE)

Defendants

U.S. Security Associates, Inc.

Bryant, Shalonda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Graham, Thomas D

Mausner, Eric J., ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Nelson, Roy E.

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Production

06/30/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Filing:

06/23/2021 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

06/23/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

06/10/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Production

06/10/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Privilege Log

06/10/2021 - Privilege Log

Response to Request for Admissions

06/08/2021 - Response to Request for Admissions

Motion for Extension of Time

06/07/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Request for Production

05/12/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Production

05/12/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Default Not Entered

05/07/2021 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/06/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

05/06/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Default

05/06/2021 - Motion for Default

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/26/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/23/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Service Returned

04/23/2021 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/12/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2600195AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:GRAHAM, THOMAS D 2601 S BAYSHORE DR STE 800 MIAMI FL 33133-5420 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/24/2021 REGISTER#:260CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: SHALONDA BRYANT Parties: Bryant Shalonda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Bryant Shalonda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2570416AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:GRAHAM, THOMAS D 2601 S BAYSHORE DR STE 800 MIAMI FL 33133-5420 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/10/2021 REGISTER#:257CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2540236AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:GRAHAM, THOMAS D 2601 S BAYSHORE DR STE 800 MIAMI FL 33133-5420 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/27/2021 REGISTER#:254CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAUSNER , ERIC J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Graham, Thomas D