This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/21/2023 at 10:42:49 (UTC).

MARCELLA ASCANO VS WAL-MART STORES EAST LP

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 MARCELLA ASCANO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ascano, Marcella

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores East LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradley D Asnis P.A.

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Production

05/08/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

05/04/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/29/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Request for Admissions

04/26/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

03/27/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

03/27/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Response to Request for Admissions

03/23/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

03/23/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

03/23/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

02/27/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Service Returned

02/07/2023 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Interrogatory

02/01/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

02/01/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/01/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/01/2023 - Request for Admissions

Complaint

01/31/2023 - Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: Wal-Mart Stores East LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120061AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:BRADLEY D ASNIS P.A.1580 SAWGRASS CORPORATE PKWY STE 401SUNRISE FL 33323-2869COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:02/02/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less