This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/20/2023 at 00:24:39 (UTC).

MANUEL V. FEIJOO, M.D., P.A. VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 MANUEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FEIJOO, M D , P A. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Manuel V. Feijoo, M.D., P.A.

Defendant

Infinity Auto Insurance Company

Assignee

OSORTO, ERNESTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Antonella Dos Santos

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/12/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/12/2023 - Statement of Claim

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

01/16/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/13/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/14/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/15/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/21/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Interrogatory

03/16/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

03/16/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

03/16/2023 - Request for Production

Notice:

03/16/2023 - Notice:

Email Notice:

03/16/2023 - Email Notice:

Amended Statement of Claim

03/16/2023 - Amended Statement of Claim

Notice of Appearance

03/23/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

03/29/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Response to Request for Admissions

03/29/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVICE@DOSSANTOS.LAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOT TO EXHAUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100049AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ANTONELLA DOS SANTOSDOS SANTOS LAW, P.A. 7480 BIRD ROAD, SUITE 740MIAMI FL 33144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/17/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090142AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ANTONELLA DOS SANTOSDOS SANTOS LAW, P.A. 7480 BIRD ROAD, SUITE 740MIAMI FL 33144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/15/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100130AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ANTONELLA DOS SANTOSDOS SANTOS LAW, P.A. 7480 BIRD ROAD, SUITE 740MIAMI FL 33144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:01/13/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less