This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/22/2023 at 21:32:53 (UTC).

MANUEL V. FEIJOO, M.D., P.A. VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 MANUEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FEIJOO, M D , P A. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Manuel V. Feijoo, M.D., P.A.

Defendant

Infinity Auto Insurance Company

Assignee

OSORTO, ERNESTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Antonella Dos Santos

Defendant Attorney

Rivera, Adrian, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Motion for Summary Judgment

08/28/2023 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion to Strike

08/28/2023 - Motion to Strike

Motion for Leave

08/28/2023 - Motion for Leave

Motion/petit for Enforcement

08/28/2023 - Motion/petit for Enforcement

Motion to Compel

08/28/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

07/13/2023 - Motion to Compel

Request for Production

03/16/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

03/16/2023 - Request for Admissions

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/14/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Leave; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Manuel V. Feijoo M.D. P.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion/petit for Enforcement; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order on Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL INITIAL DISCOVERY IS GRANTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness and Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100049AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ANTONELLA DOS SANTOSDOS SANTOS LAW, P.A. 7480 BIRD ROAD, SUITE 740MIAMI FL 33144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/17/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090142AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ANTONELLA DOS SANTOSDOS SANTOS LAW, P.A. 7480 BIRD ROAD, SUITE 740MIAMI FL 33144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/15/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100130AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ANTONELLA DOS SANTOSDOS SANTOS LAW, P.A. 7480 BIRD ROAD, SUITE 740MIAMI FL 33144COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:01/13/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less