This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 04/23/2022 at 19:21:24 (UTC).

MANUEL GARCIA VS FLOOR AND DECOR OUTLETS OF AMERICA, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 MANUEL GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FLOOR AND DECOR OUTLETS OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garcia, Manuel

Defendants

Floor and Decor Outlets of America, Inc.

Floor & Decor Holdings, Inc.

Orasi, Rick

FLOOR AND DECOR FLOOR & DECOR HOLDINGS INC

FLOOR AND DECOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dobrinsky, Manuel L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition

01/05/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Request for Production

01/05/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

01/05/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Email Notice:

01/05/2022 - Email Notice:

Complaint

01/05/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/05/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Notice of Interrogatory

01/05/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/05/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Taking Deposition

01/05/2022 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Order Extending Time for

04/20/2022 - Order Extending Time for

Motion for Extension of Time

04/19/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

04/13/2022 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Order on Motion to Compel

04/13/2022 - Order on Motion to Compel

Notice:

04/07/2022 - Notice:

Notice of Hearing-

03/29/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

03/24/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Compel

03/22/2022 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

03/22/2022 - Motion to Compel

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 1:45PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: 1) PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION PROPOUNDED ON DEFENDANT, FLOOR AND DCOR OUTLETS OF AMERICA, INC. DBA FLOOR AND DECORAND2) PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER VERIFIED ANSWERS TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED ON DEFENDANT, FLOOR AND DCOR OUTLETS OF AMERICA, INC. DBA FLOOR AND DECOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: REPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order on Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF WITHDRAWAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 8/12/22AT 1:45 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: APRIL 13, 2022 @ 10:25 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MDOBRINSKY@DDRLAWYERS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Floor and Decor Outlets of America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dobrinsky, Manuel Leon