MANUEL DREZNER VS CHAMPLAIN TOWERS SOUTH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: LIVE/IN-PERSON SPECIAL SET 9/30/2021 @ 9AM @ 73 WEST FLAGLER STREET ROOM 416 MIAMI FLORIDA, 33130

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: APPROVING PURCHASE AND SALE AGREEMENT, APPROVING COMPETITIVE BIDDING AND SALE PROCEDURES, SCHEDULING DATES TO CONDUCT AUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIVER S OMNIBUS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING RECEIVER TO RELEASE INSURANCE FUNDS PROVIDED BY UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY WAS GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION DATED AUGUST 6, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF PARTIAL COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Copies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: AGREED ORDER GRANTING RECEIVER'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILE AN ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND OBJECTIONS OF MORABITTO CONSULTANTS, INC. TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Copies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Objection:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MOTION TO QUASH AND/OR MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ETC...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE PURSUANT TO 2.510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND OBJECTION TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: SEPTEMBER 23, 2021 AT 9:00 A.M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Copies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 2:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING RECEIVER'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING RECEIVER TO SIGN PERMIT APPLICATION, ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 09/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING RECEIVER TO SIGN PERMIT APPICATION REQUESTED BY MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING RECEIVER TO RELEASE INSURANCE FUNDS PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020163AMT PAID:$100.00 NAME:CARVER, CHRISTOPHER S. 350 EAST LAS OLAS BOULEVARD SUITE 1600 FT. LAUDERDALE FL 33301 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3176-NON-FLA ATTORNEY F1$100.00$100.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$100.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/04/2021 REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Pro Hac Vice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER GRANTING RECEIVER'S EMERGENCY MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: William F Merlin Jr; Drezner Manuel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER APPROVING PROTOCOL FOR INSPECTION, DOCUMENTATION, AND STORAGE OF COMPONENTS, REMNANTS, ANDDEBRIS OF THE CHAMPLAIN TOWER SOUTH COLLAPESE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: LIVE/IN-PERSON NOTICE OF SPECIAL SET HEARING ON 9/10/2021 AT 2PM 73 WEST FLAGLER STREET MIAMI FLORIDA 33130

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Emergency Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIVER'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO APPROVE STIPULATED PROTOCOL FOR INSPECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF APPEARANCE FOR RECEIVER MICHAEL GOLDBERG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER ADOPTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES AND PROTOCOL GOVERNING PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNDER SEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Video Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 09/01/2021 AT 9AM STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Brian S Dervishi; Champlain Towers South Condominium Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.351 AND OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Video Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING INTERVENOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE OMPANY'S MOTION FORERMISSION TO WITHDRAW OR TERMINATE INTERVENTION AND COUNSEL'S REQUEST FOR REMOVALROM ALL SERVICE LISTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 08-18-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CONSENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Limited Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Withdraw; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Truitt George R; Champlain Towers South Condominium Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF COMPLAINCE WITH FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.351 AND OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 11:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CORRECTED COMPOSITE EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING RECEIVER TO SIGN PERMIT APPLICATION REQUESTED BY MIAMI-DADE COUNTY AUTHORIZING BOFAM CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. TO UNDERTAKE EMERGENCY WORK TO BRACE THE RETAINMENT WALLS AT THE PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR E-SERVICE Parties: Moskowitz Adam Matthew; Champlain Towers South Condominium Association Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Emergency Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING RECEIVER TO SIGN PERMIT APPLICATION REQUESTED BY MIAMI-DADE COUNTY AUTHORIZING BOFAM CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC....

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Attachment and/or Exhibit to Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MOTION TO INTERVENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Amend; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER GRANTING INTERVENOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY S MOTION TO INTERVENE AND INTERPLEAD FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Silva Jorge E.; Drezner Manuel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM MICHAEL I. GOLDBERG, COURT-APPOINTED RECEIVER TO MAJOR JORGE AGUIAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Limited Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF JOINDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF APPEARANCE, TERALBA, INC. OWNER OF UNITS 1107 AND 1108 IN TOWERS SOUTH CONDOMINIUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: AUGUST 4, 2021 AT 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SUA SPONTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF APPEARANCE FOR RAYSA RODRIGUEZ (JACK SCAROLA-ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Attachment and/or Exhibit to Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less