Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/13/2021 at 13:49:41 (UTC).

MANUEL DREZNER VS CHAMPLAIN TOWERS SOUTH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Case Summary

On June 24, 2021, Plaintiff Maunel Drezner (“Plaintiff”), on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, represented by Bradford R. Sohn and Javier A. Lopez, filed Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Champlain Towers South Condominium Association Inc. (“Defendant”). Plaintiff seeks injunctive and equitable relief for Defendant’s alleged negligence and breach of contract in relation to the collapse of Champlain Towers South, in which 94 people were killed. This case was filed in the Florida Dade Court System in the Miami-Dade County Courthouse. 

 

Plaintiff brings this action on behalf of himself and all others who were owners of condominium units at the property known as Champlain Towers South located at 8777 Collins Avenue, Surfside, Florida 33154 (the “Class”). The proposed class includes residents and owners whose property was compromised in the collapse. Those excluded from the class include the Defendant and any of their subsidiaries, agents, parents, or employees.

 

In his complaint, Plaintiff alleged that, “On June 24, 2021, at approximately 1:30 a.m., the 12-story condominium building known as Champlain Towers South, located at 8777 Collin Avenue, Surfside, Florida, 33154, suffered a catastrophic and traumatic collapse while residents were inside the approximately 135-unit building.” Plaintiff also alleged that, “Plaintiff and the Class suffered actual injury in the form of damages to and diminution in the value of their property, a form of tangible property for which Plaintiff and the Class entrusted Defendant and which was compromised in and, as a result of, the building’s collapse. 

 

Plaintiff further alleged that, “Defendant failed to adequately secure the building, playing lives and property of its occupants and visitors, including Plaintiff and the Class, at risk and resulting in the collapse of the building. At all relevant times, Defendant was aware, or reasonably should have been aware, that Plaintiff’s and the Class’s lives and property were at risk due to the lack of precautions taken at Champlain Towers South.” Plaintiff then alleged that, “As a direct and proximate result of Defendant’s wrongful actions and inaction and the resulting collapse of Champlain Towers South, Plaintiff and Class members have suffered immediate, and continuin increased harm.”

 

There are four claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The claims alleged are for Res Ipsa Loquitur, Negligence, Breach of Contract, and Breach of Implied Warranty of Habitability.

 

In his prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested that the Court  certify the Class as defined and appoint Plaintiff and his Counsel to represent the Class; grant injunctive and other equitable relief as is necessary to protect the interests of Plaintiff and Class members; award all recoverable damages as allowed by law in an amount to be determined at trial; award attorney fees costs and litigation expenses, as allowable by law; prejudgment interest on all amounts awarded; and such other and further relief as the Court may deem just and proper.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Drezner, Manuel

Defendant

Champlain Towers South Condominium Association Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradford R Sohn

Javier A Lopez (esq)

 

Court Documents

Complaint

06/24/2021 - Complaint

Motion to Intervene

07/08/2021 - Motion to Intervene

Amended Notice of Hearing

07/04/2021 - Amended Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing-

07/02/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Order:

07/02/2021 - Order:

Order:

07/02/2021 - Order:

Notice of Hearing-

07/02/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Order Appointing Receiver

07/02/2021 - Order Appointing Receiver

Letter of Correspondence

07/01/2021 - Letter of Correspondence

Notice of Hearing-

07/01/2021 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Limited Appearance

06/30/2021 - Notice of Limited Appearance

Order:

06/29/2021 - Order:

Order:

06/29/2021 - Order:

Order:

06/29/2021 - Order:

Motion for Pro Hac Vice

06/28/2021 - Motion for Pro Hac Vice

Motion for Pro Hac Vice

06/28/2021 - Motion for Pro Hac Vice

Notice of Interrogatory

06/28/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Letter of Correspondence

06/28/2021 - Letter of Correspondence

33 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Intervene; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR AUTHORIZATION TO (I) PAY ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR AUTHORIZATION TO REFUND SPECIAL ASSESSMENT PAYMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR AUTHORIZATION TO TERMINATE LOAN AND SECURITY AGREEMENT AND DEEM RELATED OBLIGATIONS SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AUTHORIZING RECEIVER TO MAKE TEMPORARY ASSISTANCE PAYMENTS TO RESIDENTS AND FAMILY MEMBERS OF RESIDENTS OF CHAMPLAIN TOWERS SOUTH CONDOMINIUM

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Pro Hac Vice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Pro Hac Vice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Pro Hac Vice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM SINA BAHADORAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580125AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:BRADFORD R SOHN 1600 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 1205 CORAL GABLES FL 33134-4096 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/26/2021 REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less