This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/06/2020 at 03:48:57 (UTC).

MALIK-MUHAMMAD JACKSON, KEDAR VS HUGUE, DORIS QUEEN

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 MALIK-MUHAMMAD JACKSON, KEDAR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HUGUE, DORIS QUEEN. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MALIK-MUHAMMAD JACKSON, KEDAR

Respondent

hugue, Doris Queen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jacobi, Benjamin R.

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

12/10/2019 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: North Dade Justice Center Courtroom 2-5 15555 Biscayne Blvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31741:4620; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3390004AMT PAID:$8.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3320-COPY4$1.00$4.00 3321-CERTIFIED2$2.00$4.00 TENDER TYPE:CASHTENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHANGETENDER AMT:($

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 12/10/2019 @ 1:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510023AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:JACOBI, BENJAMIN R. BENJAMIN R. JACOBI, P.A. 1313 NE 125TH ST #200 NORTH MIAMI FL 33161-5975 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Financial Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Marital Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Waiver; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Required Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.