This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 03/16/2020 at 06:28:07 (UTC).

LYN, MICHAEL G. VS LYN, KATHLEEN S.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 LYN, MICHAEL G filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LYN, KATHLEEN S. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-04

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Lynn, Michael G.

Lyn, Michael G.

Respondent

Lyn, Kathleen S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Quiat, Bette E.

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment

10/29/2019 - Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketQualified Domestic Relations Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketUnsigned Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: PROPOSED STIPULATION AND QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketLetter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO JUDGE, FROM BETTE ELLEN QUIAT, RE: PROPOSED STIPULATION AND QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Uncontested Calendar; Hearing Code: UCD; Hearing Time: 1:30PM; Hearing Location: CHC Courtroom 21-C 175 N.W. 1st Avenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment; Book/Page: 31673:1412; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketMarital Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event; Comments: FILED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketUncontested Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PATRICIA 305.279.4044

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 10-29-19 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510026AMT PAID:$409.00 NAME:QUIAT, BETTE E. 8525 SW 92ND ST STE B5 MIAMI FL 33156-7374 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3300-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$409.00$409.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$409.00 RE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketMarital Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice Designating Primary Email Address; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketRequired Information Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketPetition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.