This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/22/2023 at 10:43:02 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS OLGA T PEDRAZA

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OLGA T PEDRAZA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

Pedraza, Olga T

Miami, FL 33155-6601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason S Dragutsky

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/30/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

12/30/2022 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

01/13/2023 - Pre Trial Summons

Service Returned

01/25/2023 - Service Returned

Order of Default

02/10/2023 - Order of Default

Memorandum of Disposition

02/09/2023 - Memorandum of Disposition

Affidavit of:

03/13/2023 - Affidavit of:

Affidavit as to Costs

03/13/2023 - Affidavit as to Costs

Non-Military Affidavit

03/13/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion:

03/13/2023 - Motion:

Motion for Final Judgment

03/13/2023 - Motion for Final Judgment

Non-Military Affidavit

03/13/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit as to Costs

03/13/2023 - Affidavit as to Costs

Affidavit of:

03/13/2023 - Affidavit of:

Default Final Judgment

03/15/2023 - Default Final Judgment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 33628:1118; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Final Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Pedraza Olga T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2230019AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/17/2023REGISTER#:223CASHIER:GARCIAJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Pedraza Olga T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030899AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:JASON S DRAGUTSKY7765 SW 87TH AVE STE 101MIAMI FL 33173-2535COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:12/31/2022REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $1657.48

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less