This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/28/2023 at 08:15:07 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS OCTAVIO SILVA

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OCTAVIO SILVA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

Silva, Octavio

Miami, FL 33129-2048

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harold E Scherr (esq)

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/11/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/11/2023 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

01/26/2023 - Pre Trial Summons

Summons Returned - No Service

02/15/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Voluntary Dismissal

02/20/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:30AM; Hearing Location: DCC-County Courtroom 6-4 73 West Flagler Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33597:594; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITHOUT PREJUDICE Parties: Silva Octavio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2110050AMT PAID:$10.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:01/27/2023REGISTER#:211CASHIER:FERGUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Silva Octavio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030121AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:HAROLD E SCHERR (ESQ)MANDARICH LAW GROUP PO BOX 952289LAKE MARY FL 32795COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:01/12/2023REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less