This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 07:29:30 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS COURTNEY GILLIS

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COURTNEY GILLIS. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Joseph Caleb Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-20

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lvnv Funding Llc

Defendant

Gillis, Courtney

Miami, FL 33127-2550

Garnishee

FLOOR AND DECOR OUTLETS OF AMERICA INC.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/19/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

01/19/2022 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

02/03/2022 - Pre Trial Summons

Service Returned

02/23/2022 - Service Returned

Memorandum of Disposition

03/03/2022 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion for Default Judgment

03/10/2022 - Motion for Default Judgment

Motion for Default

03/10/2022 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

03/10/2022 - Non-Military Affidavit

Default Final Judgment

03/22/2022 - Default Final Judgment

Certificate of Service

03/25/2022 - Certificate of Service

Mot for Conti Writ of Garnish

04/27/2022 - Mot for Conti Writ of Garnish

Continuing Writ of Garnishment Issued

06/01/2022 - Continuing Writ of Garnishment Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670035AMT PAID:$85.00NAME:HAROLD E SCHERR (ESQ)MANDARICH LAW GROUP PO BOX 952289LAKE MARY FL 32795COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2134-WRIT (GARD) ADD FE1$85.00$85.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$85.00RECEIPT DATE:06/03/2022REGISTER#:267CASHIER:KAYLAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Continuing Writ of Garnishment Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Continuing Writ of Garnishment Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: FLOOR AND DECOR OUTLETS OF AMERICA INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Mot for Conti Writ of Garnish; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 33092:4727; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gillis Courtney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2110032AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ROEBUCK, ANDREA M., ESQMANDARICH LAW GROUP, LLP PO BOX 952289LAKE MARY FL 32795COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/03/2022REGISTER#:211CASHIER:AMBERE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Gillis Courtney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3010049AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:HAROLD E SCHERR (ESQ)MANDARICH LAW GROUP PO BOX 952289LAKE MARY FL 32795COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:01/26/2022REGISTER#:301CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Floor and Decor Outlets of America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant