This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/14/2021 at 03:01:14 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS BARBARO PEREZ

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BARBARO PEREZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

Perez, Barbaro

Hialeah, FL 33015-5156

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harold E Scherr (esq)

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/13/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

07/09/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

07/07/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/07/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Perez Barbaro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2980003AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:HAROLD E SCHERR (ESQ) MANDARICH LAW GROUP PO BOX 952289 LAKE MARY FL 32795 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/13/2021 REGISTER#:298CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070051AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:HAROLD E SCHERR (ESQ) MANDARICH LAW GROUP PO BOX 952289 LAKE MARY FL 32795 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/08/2021 REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $10,875.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event; Comments: $1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL