This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/10/2023 at 16:43:13 (UTC).

LUZ DEL ALBA SOTO VS LEONARD M. HOCHSTEIN, M.D. ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 LUZ DEL ALBA SOTO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against LEONARD M HOCHSTEIN, M D. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Del Alba Soto, Luz

Defendants

Hochstein, M.D., Leonard M.

Leonard M. Hochstein, M.D., P.A.

Surgery Center of North Miami, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Di Pietro, David

Defendant Attorney

William V Carcioppolo

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance

07/12/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/02/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/11/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Answer and Affirmative Defense

07/12/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Service Returned

07/02/2021 - Service Returned

Answer and Affirmative Defense

07/12/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/18/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/18/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/11/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Order of Dismissal

06/09/2023 - Order of Dismissal

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

03/27/2023 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Settlement Agreement

03/23/2023 - Settlement Agreement

Mediators Report

03/22/2023 - Mediators Report

Notice of Unavailability/absence

03/20/2023 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

03/16/2023 - Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

03/16/2023 - Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

03/10/2023 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

Exhibit List

03/09/2023 - Exhibit List

127 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: BASED ON SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33747:4511; Event Type: Event; Comments: BASED ON SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: MARCH 28, 2023 AT 8:15 A.M. VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Calendar Call; Hearing Code: CALND; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Calendar Call; Event Type: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Mediators Report; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event; Comments: MAY 3, 2023 THROUGH TUESDAY, MAY 9, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
129 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Surgery Center of North Miami LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Leonard M. Hochstein M.D. P.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670120AMT PAID:$30.00NAME:DI PIETRO, DAVID901 EAST LAS OLAS BLVD SUITE 202FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301-1147COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:06/16/2021REGISTER#:267CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2640055AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:DI PIETRO, DAVID901 EAST LAS OLAS BLVD SUITE 202FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301-1147COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:06/04/2021REGISTER#:264CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less