This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/22/2022 at 17:19:14 (UTC).

LUIS G CRUZ-MUGUERCIA VS MARIO ROMITT

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 LUIS G CRUZ-MUGUERCIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIO ROMITT. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cruz-Muguercia, Luis G

Defendant

ROMITT, MARIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Antelo, Orlando, Jr

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/21/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

03/21/2022 - Complaint

Notice of Appearance

03/21/2022 - Notice of Appearance

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/25/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

03/30/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Affidavit of Service

05/02/2022 - Affidavit of Service

Motion to Dismiss

05/18/2022 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Appearance

05/18/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Amended Complaint

06/13/2022 - Amended Complaint

Answer to Amended Complaint

06/21/2022 - Answer to Amended Complaint

Request for Production

06/21/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

06/21/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer to Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: ROMITT MARIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080056AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ANTELO, ORLANDO, JR.2103 CORAL WAY STE 805MIAMI FL 33145-2637COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:03/30/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030023AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:ANTELO, ORLANDO, JR.2103 CORAL WAY STE 805MIAMI FL 33145-2637COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:03/23/2022REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Change UCR JURY Characteristic; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Antelo, Orlando, Jr