This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/28/2021 at 07:04:43 (UTC).

LUIS CASTILLO ET AL VS AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 LUIS CASTILLO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Castillo, Reina

Castillo, Luis

Macchi, Rafael

Defendant

Avatar Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Juan P Gonzalez-Sirgo

Defendant Attorneys

Scolaro, Timothy Robert

Rodriguez, Emilio Jose, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition

08/23/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

08/16/2021 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/16/2021 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/13/2021 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice of Taking Deposition

08/10/2021 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

07/29/2021 - Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Response to Request for Production

07/14/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Production

07/14/2021 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

07/14/2021 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Privilege Log

07/14/2021 - Privilege Log

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

07/13/2021 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Notice of Unavailability/absence

06/29/2021 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Motion to Compel

06/25/2021 - Motion to Compel

Response to Request for Admissions

06/18/2021 - Response to Request for Admissions

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

06/14/2021 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Order Extending Time for

06/14/2021 - Order Extending Time for

Motion for Extension of Time

06/01/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/10/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 09-15-2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2530326AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:JUAN P GONZALEZ-SIRGO JP GONZALEZ-SIRGO PA 814 PONCE DE LEON BOULVARD SU CORAL GABLES FL 33134-3156 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/19/2021 REGISTER#:253CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (A) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2500039AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:JUAN P GONZALEZ-SIRGO JP GONZALEZ-SIRGO PA 814 PONCE DE LEON BOULVARD SU CORAL GABLES FL 33134-3156 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/17/2021 REGISTER#:250CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less