This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 07/25/2022 at 20:22:31 (UTC).

LUIS A CLARO ET AL VS FAMOUS S COLLIER ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 LUIS A CLARO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FAMOUS S COLLIER. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLARO, LUIS A

VIERA, NILDA

Defendants

COLLIER, FAMOUS S

HERTZ VEHICLES, LLC

HERTZ CORPORATION (THE)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tison, Devon P

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/27/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

06/03/2022 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/09/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/09/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/09/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/17/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/17/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/17/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

06/29/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

06/29/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

06/29/2022 - Service Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: HERTZ VEHICLES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: HERTZ CORPORATION (THE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: COLLIER FAMOUS S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070142AMT PAID:$30.00NAME:TISON, DEVON P2933 W CYPRESS CREEK RD STE 201FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309-1760COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:06/11/2022REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160003AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:TISON, DEVON P2933 W CYPRESS CREEK RD STE 201FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309-1760COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:06/04/2022REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERTZ VEHICLES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Hertz Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tison, Devon P