This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/06/2020 at 02:18:45 (UTC).

LUBELL & ROSEN LLC VS MACRON DEVICES, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 LUBELL ROSEN LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MACRON DEVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lubell & Rosen LLC

Defendants

Macron Devices, LLC

Stimwave Technologies Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sheskin, Joshua H

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover

12/17/2019 - Civil Cover

Complaint

12/17/2019 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/19/2019 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/19/2019 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/26/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/26/2019 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Motion for Default

03/20/2020 - Motion for Default

Motion for Default

03/20/2020 - Motion for Default

Service Returned

03/20/2020 - Service Returned

Service Returned

03/20/2020 - Service Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Macron Devices LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Stimwave Technologies Incorporated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/25/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3290053AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:SHESKIN, JOSHUA H 300 71ST ST STE 605 MIAMI BEACH FL 33141-3089 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3470113AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:SHESKIN, JOSHUA H 300 71ST ST STE 605 MIAMI BEACH FL 33141-3089 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Stimwave Technologies Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Lubell & Rosen, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Micron Devices, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHESKIN JOSHUA H