This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/11/2020 at 04:57:09 (UTC).

LOURDES VINAS VS ANSA MCAL U.S. INC.

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 LOURDES VINAS filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ANSA MCAL U S INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vinas, Lourdes

Defendant

ANSA McAL U.S. Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bujan, Daniel J., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/03/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/06/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/07/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Complaint

01/03/2020 - Complaint

Service Returned

01/19/2020 - Service Returned

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

02/03/2020 - Notice of Removal to Federal Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Book/Page: 31807:394; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ANSA McAL U.S. Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ANSA McAL U.S. Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560165AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:BUJAN, DANIEL J., ESQ 44 W FLAGLER ST STE 2200 MIAMI FL 33130 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560127AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:BUJAN, DANIEL J., ESQ 44 W FLAGLER ST STE 2200 MIAMI FL 33130 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bujan, Daniel J., ESQ