This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/28/2023 at 06:39:46 (UTC).

LOANCARE, LLC VS ANA-MARIA MARDINI ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 LOANCARE, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANA-MARIA MARDINI. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LoanCare, LLC

Defendants

Mardini, Ana-Maria

Hernandez, Maria Carmne

Asset Acceptance LLC

Barclays Bank Delaware

C&F Finance Company

Cach, LLC

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

Clerk of Court of Miami-Dade County

Equable Ascent Financial, LLC

Ford Motor Credit Company

Hammocks Community Association, Inc.

Hawker Financial Corporation

Lakeview At The Hammocks Condominium I Association

Lendr.Online, LLC

Jaramillo, Sandrine R

Midland Funding, LLC

MMG Colonial Holdings, LLC

MRC Receivables Corp

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kasper, Kathryn Ishee

 

Court Documents

Service Returned

02/24/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

02/24/2023 - Service Returned

Answer

02/23/2023 - Answer

Service Return for Unknown Party

02/22/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

02/22/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

02/22/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

02/22/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

02/22/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

02/22/2023 - Service Returned

Lis Pendens

02/01/2023 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

01/31/2023 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Complaint

01/31/2023 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/31/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIA CARMEN HERNANDEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33565:3860; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less