This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/21/2021 at 14:19:42 (UTC).

LKCM CAPITAL PARTNERS I LP VS GASTON MARQUEVICH ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/31/2020 LKCM CAPITAL PARTNERS I LP filed an Other lawsuit against GASTON MARQUEVICH. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LKCM CAPITAL PARTNERS I LP

Defendants and Garnishees

MARQUEVICH, GASTON

OPTIMUM BAYOU LLC

OPTIMUM GRAIN BINS LLC

OPTIMUM LAMBERT LLC

SAN MIGUEL, ALBERTO

OPTIMUM CLOWERS LLC

OPTIMUM TALIAFERRO LLC

AGRI COMPANY

OPTIMUM RANCH LLC

OPTIMUM AGRICULTURE LLC

OPTIMUM PROCESSORS LLC

Bank of America

City National Bank of Florida

Wells Fargo Bank NA

Deutsche Bank

Optimum Agriculture FL LLC

Northern Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mosley, Patrick M

Defendant and Garnishee Attorneys

Matthew S Sarelson Esq

Noa, Joseph A

Acevedo, Diana C., ESQ

Kent, John B

 

Court Documents

Garnishment Rejection Letter

09/08/2021 - Garnishment Rejection Letter

Writ of Garnishment Issued

09/08/2021 - Writ of Garnishment Issued

Order:

09/02/2021 - Order:

Motion for Garnishment

09/02/2021 - Motion for Garnishment

Final Jdgmt Agnst Garnish $

10/13/2020 - Final Jdgmt Agnst Garnish $

Notice of Recording of Foreign Judgment

05/04/2020 - Notice of Recording of Foreign Judgment

Recorded Document

03/31/2020 - Recorded Document

Foreign Judgment Filed

03/31/2020 - Foreign Judgment Filed

Notice of Appearance

03/08/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Response:

03/01/2021 - Response:

Rejection Letter Sent

03/01/2021 - Rejection Letter Sent

Letter of Correspondence Processed

02/10/2021 - Letter of Correspondence Processed

Request for Copies

02/10/2021 - Request for Copies

Order:

01/27/2021 - Order:

Order:

01/27/2021 - Order:

Motion:

01/27/2021 - Motion:

Motion:

01/27/2021 - Motion:

Receipt:

11/23/2020 - Receipt:

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Garnishment Rejection Letter; Event Type: Event; Comments: $85 WRIT FEE WAS PREVIOUSLY PAID. Parties: LKCM CAPITAL PARTNERS I LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Garnishment Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Garnishment Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: MAILED TO ATTY. Parties: Northern Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF POST-JUDGMENT WRIT OF GARNISHMENT GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Garnishment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Matthew S Sarelson Esq; MARQUEVICH GASTON; OPTIMUM AGRICULTURE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO THE CHARGING ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Rejection Letter Sent; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2060014AMT PAID:$20.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3121-CERTIFIED3$2.00$6.00 3120-COPY4$1.00$4.00 3188-REFUND (FEE - CIR)1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/10/2021 REGISTER#:206CASHIER:FERGUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence Processed; Event Type: Event; Comments: MAILED TO HILL WARD HENDERSON ATTORNEY AT LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Registered Mail; Event Type: Event; Comments: RF 156 955 465 US (AGRI)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Registered Mail; Event Type: Event; Comments: RF 156 955 457 US (ALBERTO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Registered Mail; Event Type: Event; Comments: RF 156 955 443 US (GASTON)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Copy of Notice and Judgment Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Recording of Foreign Judgment; Book/Page: 31923:72; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2200004AMT PAID:$819.70 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$105.00$105.00 3154-REGISTERED MAIL (11$271.70$271.70 3133-NOTICE OF RECORDIN1$42.00$42.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$724.70 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$95.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/29/2020 REGISTER#:220CASHIER:SFLOWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT AND AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Recorded Document; Book/Page: 31916:3064; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Foreign Judgment Filed; Book/Page: 31916:3077; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPTIMUM AGRICULTURE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where City National Bank of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases where The Northern Trust Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant