Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/27/2021 at 11:37:05 (UTC).

LIRA CONSUEGRA VS STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 LIRA CONSUEGRA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-25

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Coral Gables District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Consuegra, Lira

Defendant

State National Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carlos Santi

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/22/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/20/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Interrogatory

02/12/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/12/2021 - Request for Production

Complaint

02/12/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/12/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580069AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:CARLOS SANTI PROPERTY & CASUALTY LAW GROUP 2307 DOUGLAS RD. SUI MIAMI FL 33145 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/23/2021 REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: State National Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2600055AMT PAID:$400.00 NAME:CARLOS SANTI PROPERTY & CASUALTY LAW GROUP 2307 DOUGLAS RD. SUI MIAMI FL 33145 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$400.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/13/2021 REGISTER#:260CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event; Comments: $30,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Santi, Carlos L