This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/03/2021 at 02:37:08 (UTC).

LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY VS SOUTHPARK MANAGEMENT, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against SOUTHPARK MANAGEMENT, LLC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY

Defendants

ATLANTIC ONE AT THE POINT

SOUTHPARK MANAGEMENT, LLC

ATLANTIC 1 AT THE POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Behar, Aaron, ESQ

Chevres, Jeremy A

 

Court Documents

Motion to Strike

09/07/2021 - Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike

09/07/2021 - Motion to Strike

Answer and Affirmative Defense

09/01/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Answer and Affirmative Defense

08/23/2021 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Exhibit List

08/12/2021 - Exhibit List

Amended Complaint

08/12/2021 - Amended Complaint

Notice of Appearance

07/30/2021 - Notice of Appearance

AgreedOrder

07/29/2021 - AgreedOrder

Order:

07/29/2021 - Order:

Service Returned

07/15/2021 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/18/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/18/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/15/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/15/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Complaint

03/24/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/24/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT/AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Parties: Behar Aaron ESQ; LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SOUTHPARK MANAGEMENT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S AMENDED COMPLAINT Parties: ATLANTIC 1 AT THE POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Chevres Jeremy A; ATLANTIC ONE AT THE POINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED. SEE ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SOUTHPARK MANAGEMENT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: ATLANTIC ONE AT THE POINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: SOUTHPARK MANAGEMENT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2890239AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:BEHAR, AARON, ESQ 490 SAWGRASS CORPORATE PARKWAY SUITE 300 SUNRISE FL 33325 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/17/2021 REGISTER#:289CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2590090AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:BEHAR, AARON, ESQ 490 SAWGRASS CORPORATE PARKWAY SUITE 300 SUNRISE FL 33325 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:03/26/2021 REGISTER#:259CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATLANTIC II AT THE POINT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION I is a litigant

Latest cases where Lincoln Benefit Life Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chevres, Jeremy A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Behar, Aaron, ESQ