This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/23/2020 at 23:27:07 (UTC).

LILIAM ALVAREZ VS ELMO L. URRA ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 LILIAM ALVAREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ELMO L URRA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVAREZ, LILIAM

Defendants

ALVAREZ, DORYS A.

URRA, ELMO L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Feuer, Aaron

Defendant Attorney

Schilling, Tawna S., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Certificate of No Objections to Production

05/20/2020 - Certificate of No Objections to Production

Subpoena

05/07/2020 - Subpoena

Request for Production

04/17/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Copies

04/01/2020 - Request for Copies

Subpoena

04/01/2020 - Subpoena

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

03/27/2020 - Amended Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

02/28/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

02/27/2020 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Notice of Jury Trial

02/17/2020 - Notice of Jury Trial

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

01/13/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

01/13/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

01/13/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

01/03/2020 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

Notice of Appearance

12/12/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Interrogatory

12/12/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

12/12/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Service Returned

11/27/2019 - Service Returned

Request for Admissions

11/18/2019 - Request for Admissions

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Calendar Call; Hearing Code: CALND; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Calendar Call; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of No Objections to Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Copies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Subpoena; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Subpoena; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.