This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/12/2022 at 04:42:59 (UTC).

LESLIE (GUARDIAN) ORTIZ ET AL VS A PLACE FOR ROVER INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 LESLIE GUARDIAN ORTIZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against A PLACE FOR ROVER INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ortiz, Leslie (Guardian)

Sanchez, Amaury (Guardian)

Sanchez, Alice (Minor)

Defendants

A Place for Rover Inc

Jaramillo, John

Ortiz, Diana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ortega, Osvaldo J

 

Court Documents

Complaint

01/26/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/26/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Order of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record

09/02/2022 - Order of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record

Amended Notice of Hearing

07/21/2022 - Amended Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing-

07/21/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

07/21/2022 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice:

07/11/2022 - Notice:

Notice:

07/11/2022 - Notice:

Notice:

07/11/2022 - Notice:

Notice:

07/11/2022 - Notice:

Motion to Withdraw

07/07/2022 - Motion to Withdraw

Notice:

07/07/2022 - Notice:

Notice:

07/07/2022 - Notice:

Order Setting CM Deadline

07/01/2022 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Motion for Sanctions

06/23/2022 - Motion for Sanctions

Affidavit of Service

06/15/2022 - Affidavit of Service

Request for Production

06/07/2022 - Request for Production

Request for Production

06/07/2022 - Request for Production

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL DUE TO IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Notice of Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: AUGUST 23, 2022, AT 10:00 A.M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: JUNE 21, 2022, AT 10:00 A.M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: AUGUST 23, 2022 @ 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: A PLACE FOR ROVER WITHDRAWAL OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: A PLACE FOR ROVER WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: A PLACE FOR ROVER'S WITHDRAWAL OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Jaramillo John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: A Place for Rover Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2980087AMT PAID:$30.00NAME:ORTEGA, OSVALDO J135 SAN LORENZO AVENUESUITE 500CORAL GABLES FL 33146COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:02/10/2022REGISTER#:298CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2970161AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:ORTEGA, OSVALDO J135 SAN LORENZO AVENUESUITE 500CORAL GABLES FL 33146COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:01/28/2022REGISTER#:297CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A PLACE FOR ROVER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ortega, Osvaldo J