This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/11/2020 at 18:53:18 (UTC).

LEONARDO MIRANDA VS SOUTHEASTERN ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 LEONARDO MIRANDA filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against SOUTHEASTERN ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miranda, Leonardo

Defendant

SOUTHEASTERN ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Basnuevo, Javier A.

Defendant Attorney

Joseph W Lawrence II

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/09/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/09/2020 - Complaint

Notice of Interrogatory

01/09/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/09/2020 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/13/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/13/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

01/30/2020 - Service Returned

Answer and Affirmative Defense

02/12/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Service of Process

03/09/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Response to Request for Production

03/09/2020 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Service of Process

03/10/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SIGNED/VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Joseph W Lawrence II; SOUTHEASTERN ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560129AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:BASNUEVO, JAVIER A. 2665 S. BAYSHORE DRIVESUITE 300 COCONUT GROVE FL 33133 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SOUTHEASTERN ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3550183AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:BASNUEVO, JAVIER A. 2665 S. BAYSHORE DRIVESUITE 300 COCONUT GROVE FL 33133 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph W Lawrence Ii