This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/07/2023 at 09:01:10 (UTC).

LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST 2021-SL2 MORTGAGE-BAC VS MUNIR AHMED ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST 2021-SL2 MORTGAGE-BAC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MUNIR AHMED. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Legacy Mortgage Asset Trust 2021-SL2 Mortgage-Bac

Mortgage-Backed Notes Series 2021-Sl 2

Us Bank Trust National Association

Defendants

Ahmed, Munir

Munir, Imran

Ahmed, Saeeda

Imram, Noreen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Collins, Sara Beth

 

Court Documents

Order of Dismissal

11/23/2022 - Order of Dismissal

Final Disposition Document

11/18/2022 - Final Disposition Document

Notice:

11/18/2022 - Notice:

Voluntary Dismissal

11/18/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

Service Returned

11/15/2022 - Service Returned

Service Return for Unknown Party

11/14/2022 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Return for Unknown Party

11/14/2022 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

11/14/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

11/14/2022 - Service Returned

Service Returned

11/14/2022 - Service Returned

Motion for Extension of Time

11/03/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

11/03/2022 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/24/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/24/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/24/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/24/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/24/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/24/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33480:941; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISMISSING ACTION AND RELEASING THE LIS PENDENS Parties: Ahmed Munir; Munir Imran; Ahmed Saeeda; Imram Noreen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33473:3789; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ahmed Munir; Munir Imran; Ahmed Saeeda; Imram Noreen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33434:3223; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MRSERVICE@MCCALLA.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less