Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/27/2021 at 19:12:01 (UTC).

LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST 2019 SL3 VS JUAN JOSE ABAD ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST 2019 SL3 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JUAN JOSE ABAD. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Legacy Mortgage Asset Trust 2019 Sl3

US Bank Trust National Association

Defendants

Abad, Juan Jose

Abad, Juan J

Diaz, Marilyn

San Mateo First Addition Homeowners Assn Inc

Berenfeld Spritzer Shechter Sheer LLP

Cach Llc

Miami Dade County A Political Subdivision

Rosales De Mengotti, Rosa

Rosales, Rosa

State Of Florida Department Of Revenue

Acevedo Pa, Reinier

Design Builders Roofing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Collins, Sara Beth

 

Court Documents

Lis Pendens

06/10/2021 - Lis Pendens

Notice:

06/10/2021 - Notice:

Complaint

06/10/2021 - Complaint

Email Notice:

06/10/2021 - Email Notice:

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

06/10/2021 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

06/10/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Lis Pendens

06/10/2021 - Lis Pendens

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2060053AMT PAID:$130.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE13$10.00$130.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$130.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/18/2021 REGISTER#:206CASHIER:FERGUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Abad Juan Jose; Diaz Marilyn; San Mateo First Addition Homeowners Assn Inc; Berenfeld Spritzer Shechter Sheer LLP; Cach Llc; Miami Dade County A Political Subdivision; Rosales De Mengotti Rosa; State Of Florida Department Of Revenue; Acevedo Pa Reinier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2650134AMT PAID:$416.00 NAME:COLLINS, SARA BETH MCCALLA RAYMER PIERCE, LLC 225 E ROBINSON ST SUITE ORLANDO FL 32801-4326 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.00 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$10.00$10.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$416.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/11/2021 REGISTER#:265CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32572:1248; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: MRSERVICE@MCCALLA.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGACY MORTGAGE ASSET TRUST 2019-GS3 is a litigant

Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARA B COLLINS, ESQ