This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/26/2020 at 06:01:50 (UTC).

LAW OFFICE OF PELAYO DURAN, PA VS PRIMERO AUTO PARTS, INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 LAW OFFICE OF PELAYO DURAN, PA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PRIMERO AUTO PARTS, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAW OFFICE OF PELAYO DURAN, PA

Defendants

BRUSCANTINI, EMILIO

PRIMERO AUTO PARTS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zacarias, Christopher F.

Defendant Attorney

Rodriguez, Ricardo A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Production

05/20/2020 - Request for Production

Order:

05/13/2020 - Order:

Notice of Appearance

05/08/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Hearing-

05/01/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Order of Referral to Mediation Unit

05/01/2020 - Order of Referral to Mediation Unit

Order:

04/28/2020 - Order:

Notice of Hearing-

04/06/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

02/26/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Notice of Hearing-

02/26/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion for Attorneys Fees

02/26/2020 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Service Returned

02/20/2020 - Service Returned

Service Returned

02/20/2020 - Service Returned

Complaint

02/13/2020 - Complaint

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/19/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/19/2020 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/18/2020 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/18/2020 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Referral to Mediation Unit; Event Type: Event; Comments: 05/12/20 @1:30PMROOM 1700

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: REQUIRING CORPORATION TO RETAIN LEGAL REPRESENTATION

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450007AMT PAID:$20.00 NAME:ZACARIAS, CHRISTOPHER F. 5757 BLUE LAGOON DR STE 230 MIAMI FL 33126-2035 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BRUSCANTINI EMILIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PRIMERO AUTO PARTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3550026AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:ZACARIAS, CHRISTOPHER F. 5757 BLUE LAGOON DR STE 230 MIAMI FL 33126-2035 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: 15,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.