This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/31/2023 at 15:11:11 (UTC).

LAURENCE ABRAMSON VS MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.,

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 LAURENCE ABRAMSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC ,. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Abramson, Laurence

Defendant

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Orenstein, Jessica A

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/31/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/31/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/08/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Interrogatory

02/08/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/08/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

02/08/2023 - Request for Admissions

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/10/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

02/20/2023 - Service Returned

Order Setting CM Deadline

04/28/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Amended Complaint

05/30/2023 - Amended Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100028AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ORENSTEIN, JESSICA A9130 S. DADELAND BLVD. SUITE 1209MIAMI FL 33156COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:02/11/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140232AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:ORENSTEIN, JESSICA A9130 S. DADELAND BLVD. SUITE 1209MIAMI FL 33156COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:02/01/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less