This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/13/2019 at 10:13:24 (UTC).

LAROCCA CHIROPRACTIC CENTERS, LLC. VS ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 LAROCCA CHIROPRACTIC CENTERS, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LaRocca Chiropractic Centers, LLC.

Assignor

Williams, Lafarrell

Defendant

ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rock, Gregory

Defendant Attorneys

La Montagne, Rachel

Sargent, Ivane

 

Court Documents

Request:

05/13/2019 - Request:

Motion to Dismiss

05/10/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Memorandum of Disposition

04/22/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

04/18/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Request for Production

04/17/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Appearance

04/17/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Pre Trial Summons

03/11/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Memorandum of Disposition

03/04/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Statement of Claim

01/24/2019 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Hearing-

06/21/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion for Extension of Time

06/13/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

04/18/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Request for Admissions

04/17/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

04/17/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Letter of Correspondence

04/17/2019 - Letter of Correspondence

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: AGREED ON DEF'S MTN FOR MORE DEFINITE STATE AND/OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND/OR DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • SP Pretrial New Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2260013AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3530020AMT PAID:$80.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/25/2019 REGISTER#:353CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less